EP2040007 - METAL PANEL, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF AND COOKING DEVICE USING THE METAL PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/13] | Metal panel, manufacturing method thereof and cooking device using the metal panel | ||
[2019/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyung Jin 406, Heungan-ri, Heunghae-eup, Buk-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 02 /
Kwon, Yong Hyon No. 5206-403, Chodangmaeul-hyeonjin-everville Jung-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Hong, Seok Weon No. 523-1906, Samsung 5th Apt., Pungdeokcheon-ri Suji-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Tae Uk No. 203-1301, Anhwamamaeul-woonam-firstville-2nd Byeongjeom-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Cho, Pung Yeun No. 643-1502, Sinnamusil-sinwon Apt. Yeongtong-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kang, Han Seong No. 205-1503, Jeongdeunmaeul, 858, Byeongjeom-ri Taean-eup, Hwasung-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Park, Sung Soo No. 106-1404, Hansin Apt., Byeongjeom-ri Taean-eup, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
Sung, Han Jun No. 1704-1803, Hosumaeul-summit-ville Apt. Dongbaek-dong Yongin-si, Giheung-gu Gyeonggi-do / KR | 09 /
Kim, Sung Kwang 2F, 811-9, Bono-3-dong, Sangrok-gu, Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 10 /
Kim, Tae Hun No. 895, 23-21, Yongsan-dong-2ga, Yongsan-gu Seoul / KR | 11 /
Kang, Min Jae No. 5-703, Sinhwa Apt., Naedeok-2-dong Sangdang-gu, Cheongju-si Chungbuk / KR | [2020/13] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Kim, Hyung Jin 406, Heungan-ri, Heunghae-eup, Buk-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kwon, Yong Hyon No. 5206-403, Chodangmaeul-hyeonjin-everville Jung-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Hong, Seok Weon No. 523-1906, Samsung 5th Apt., Pungdeokcheon-ri Suji-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Tae Uk No. 203-1301, Anhwamamaeul-woonam-firstville-2nd Byeongjeom-dong, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Cho, Pung Yeun No. 643-1502, Sinnamusil-sinwon Apt., Yeongtong-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Kang, Han Seong No. 205-1503, Jeongdeunmaeul, 858, Byeongjeom-ri Taean-eup, Hwasung-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
07 /
Park, Sung Soo No. 106-1404, Hansin Apt., Byeongjeom-ri Taean-eup, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
08 /
Sung, Han Jun No. 1704-1803, Hosumaeul-summit-ville Apt., Dongbaek-dong Yongin-si, Giheung-gu Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
09 /
Kim, Sung Kwang 2F, 811-9, Bono-3-dong, Sangrok-gu, Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
10 /
Kim, Tae Hun No. 895, 23-21, Yongsan-dong-2ga, Yongsan-gu Seoul / KR | |||
11 /
Kang, Min Jae No. 5-703, Sinhwa Apt., Naedeok-2-dong Sangdang-gu, Cheongju-si Chungbuk / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/13] |
Former [2009/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08160036.3 | 09.07.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | KR20070096896 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: KR 20070096896 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040007 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2040007 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040007 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02, B21D39/03, B21D51/52 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
F24C15/02 (EP,US);
H05B6/80 (KR);
B21D39/032 (EP,US);
E06B3/827 (US);
B21D51/52 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | F24C15/02, H05K5/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/13] |
Former [2010/04] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | METALLPLATTE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND KOCHVORRICHTUNG MIT METALLPLATTE | [2019/47] | English: | METAL PANEL, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF AND COOKING DEVICE USING THE METAL PANEL | [2019/47] | French: | PANNEAU MÉTALLIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON UTILISANT LE PANNEAU MÉTALLIQUE | [2019/47] |
Former [2009/13] | Metallplatte, Herstellungsverfahren dafür und Kochvorrichtung mit Metallplatte | ||
Former [2009/13] | Metal panel, manufacturing method thereof and cooking device using the metal panel | ||
Former [2009/13] | Panneau métallique, son procédé de fabrication et dispositif de cuisson utilisant le panneau métallique | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2109277 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,5; | [Y]JPH03497 (HITACHI CABLE) [Y] 2,7,8 * abstract *; | [X]JPH0927686 (KAWAMURA ELECTRIC INC) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2003318567 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * [Y] 2,7,8; | [A]DE10303131 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 4* paragraph [0028]; figure - * | Examination | US1651542 | US2023948 | US2553922 | GB938245 | by applicant | JPH0927686 | JP2003318567 |