EP2046050 - Moving-picture coding device and method with inter-field motion compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/15] | Moving-picture coding device and moving-picture coding method | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Akira Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Miyoshi, Hidenobu Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Kazui, Kimihiko Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Hisanari Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1, Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | [2017/14] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Nakagawa, Akira Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Miyoshi, Hidenobu Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Kazui, Kimihiko Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Kimura, Hisanari Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1, Momochihama 2-chome Sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2009/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08160137.9 | 10.07.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | JP20070184011 | 13.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007184011 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2046050 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2046050 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046050 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/107, H04N19/16, H04N19/17, H04N19/174, H04N19/186, H04N19/523, H04N19/55 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/55 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/16 (EP,US);
H04N19/17 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (KR);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/523 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | H04N7/50 | ||
Former IPC [2009/15] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/40] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Kodierung bewegter Bilder mit Zwischenrasterbewegungskompensation | [2016/46] | English: | Moving-picture coding device and method with inter-field motion compensation | [2016/46] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de codage d'images animées avec une compensation de mouvement inter-champs | [2016/46] |
Former [2009/15] | Vorrichtung zur Kodierung bewegter Bilder und Verfahren zur Kodierung bewegter Bilder | ||
Former [2009/15] | Moving-picture coding device and moving-picture coding method | ||
Former [2009/15] | Dispositif de codage d'images en mouvement et procédé de codage d'images en mouvement | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 04.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.05.2016 | 11.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1406448 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs[0070]-[0078] ** figures 19-21 *; | [I]US2007071398 (RAVEENDRAN VIJAYALAKSHMI R [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0047]-[0049], [0062] *; | [I]US2007110154 (WANG YI-KUI [FI], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016], [0042]-[0054], [0070]-[0079] *; | [A] - WANG, "Isolated Regions: Motivation, Prob's, and Sol'ns", 3. JVT MEETING; 60. MPEG MEETING; 06-05-2002 - 10-05-2002; FAIRFAX,US; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20020510), no. JVT-C072, ISSN 0000-0442, XP030005181 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | Examination | US5412435 | by applicant | JP2007184011 |