EP1988396 - Method for proving fertility improving or contraceptive agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaupp, U., Benjamin Saarstrasse 86 52062, Aachen / DE | 02 /
Hildebrand, Eilo Dellstrasse 66 52072, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Weyand, Ingbert, Dr. Nonnenstrombergstrasse 15 50939 Köln / DE | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
Kaupp, U., Benjamin Saarstrasse 86 52062, Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
Hildebrand, Eilo Dellstrasse 66 52072, Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
Weyand, Ingbert Eupenstrasse 225 52066, Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08160668.3 | 30.01.2004 | [2008/45] | Priority number, date | DE2003103973 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10303973 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988396 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1988396 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/50 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
G01N33/5029 (EP);
G01N33/5008 (EP);
G01N33/5044 (EP);
G01N33/582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Nachweis von fertilitätssteigernden oder kontrazeptiven Wirkstoffen | [2008/45] | English: | Method for proving fertility improving or contraceptive agents | [2008/45] | French: | Procédé de vérification d'agents actifs augmentant la fertilité ou contraceptifs | [2008/45] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04706602.2 / EP1590672 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040706602) is 26.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2004 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | IT | 11.04.2012 | NL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
SE | 11.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9948902 (WAYNE HUGHES INST [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 23, line 16 - page 24, line 7; figures 2A,2B; examples 2,3 * [A] 6,7; | [XA] - WARD G E ET AL, "CHEMOTAXIS OF ARBACIA-PUNCTULATA SPERMATOZOA TO RESACT A PEPTIDE FROM THE EGG JELLY LAYER", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 101, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 2324 - 2329, XP002282308 [X] 1-5,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.101.6.2324 | [XA] - TATSU Y ET AL, "A caged sperm-activating peptide that has a photocleavable protecting group on the backbone amide", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020814), vol. 525, no. 1-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 20 - 24, XP004375887 [X] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(02)03000-4 | [PX] - KAUPP U BENJAMIN ET AL, "The signal flow and motor response controlling chemotaxis of sea urchin sperm.", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (200302), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1465-7392 (ISSN print), pages 109 - 117, XP001181602 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 00 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb915 | [A] - WIESNER B ET AL, "Measurement of intracellular Ca2+ changes using novel caged cyclic nucleotides and confocal laser scanning microscopy", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B BIOLOGY, (199904), vol. 49, no. 2-3, ISSN 1011-1344, pages 112 - 119, XP002282307 [A] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1011-1344(99)00036-6 | [A] - FURUTA T ET AL, "PHOTOCHEMICAL PROPERTIES OF NEW PHOTOLABILE CAMP DERIVATIVES IN A PHYSIOLOGICAL SALINE SOLUTION", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19950630), vol. 60, no. 13, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3953 - 3956, XP000611481 [A] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00118a008 |