EP2019330 - Display panel and method for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TPO Displays Corp. No. 12, Ke Jung Road Science-Based Industrial Park Chu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Louwsma, Hendrik Stationstraat 39G 6411 NK Heerlen / NL | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/05] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08160722.8 | 18.07.2008 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | US20070950732P | 19.07.2007 Original published format: US 950732 P | US20080054116 | 24.03.2008 Original published format: US 54116 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019330 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019330 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, H04N13/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
G02B30/30 (EP);
G02B30/27 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | Anzeigetafel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2009/05] | English: | Display panel and method for the same | [2009/05] | French: | Panneau d'affichage et son procédé | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08331605 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,4,7-15 * figures 1-22 *; | [Y]US5751479 (HAMAGISHI GORO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-14* column 14, line 45 - column 16, line 53; figure 14 *; | [XY]US5956001 (SUMIDA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7-9,15 * column 22, line 66 - column 24, line 59; figure 13 * [Y] 10-14; | [XY]US5991074 (NOSE HIROYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7-9,15 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 38; figure 6 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 16; figure 9 * [Y] 10-14; | [XY]GB2406731 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,7-9,15 * page 29, line 6 - page 30, line 16; figure 12c * * page 25, line 5 - page 29, line 4; figures 12a, 12b * * page 30, line 18 - page 31, line 33; figure 13 * [Y] 10-14 |