EP2020553 - Axial swage connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cold Work Technology Limited 66 Queens Road Aberdeen Aberdeenshire, AB15 6YE / GB | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westland, Andrew 66 Queens Road Aberdeen Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB15 4YE / GB | [2009/06] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/06] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08160823.4 | 21.07.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | GB20070014801 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: GB 0714801 | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020553 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2020553 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/14 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
F16L13/146 (EP,GB);
F16L13/14 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/01] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Axial kaltverformte Kupplungen | [2009/06] | English: | Axial swage connectors | [2009/06] | French: | Raccords sertis axialement | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9200483 (LOKRING CORP [US]); | [A]US6450553 (SURESH SRINIVAS B [US]); | [A]US2006186666 (MCKAY ALBERT A [CA]); | [Y]WO2006096969 (LOKRING TECHNOLOGY CORP [CA], et al) |