EP1977903 - Printing plate for lacquers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Folex Coating GmbH Unnauer Weg 6c 50767 Köln / DE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schleussner, Martin Darmiansweg 44 50765, Köln / DE | 02 /
Weber, Arne Lochnerstrasse 23 52064, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Dietrich, Thomas Ahornweg 6 50859, Köln / DE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Schreiber, Christoph Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08161263.2 | 04.11.2005 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | DE20041053824 | 04.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053824 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977903 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41N1/12, B41C1/05, B41N1/00 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B41N1/00 (EP);
B41M1/00 (EP);
B41M1/04 (EP);
B41M1/06 (EP);
B41N10/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | Druckform für Lacke | [2008/41] | English: | Printing plate for lacquers | [2008/41] | French: | Plaque d'impression pour laques | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/46] | Appeal following examination | 06.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T1711/13 | 21.06.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.04.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05110333.1 / EP1655145 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050110333) is 28.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2559426 [ ] (FERRE JEAN MICHEL [FR]) [ ] * page 3, line 24 *; | [X]DE3523269 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * claim 4 * * claim 8 * * page 17, line 14 * * page 23, line 12 * * page 37, line 27 *; | EP0306933 [ ] (BONNER ZEITUNGSDRUCKEREI [DE]) [ ] * column 4, line 46 *; | [DY]DE19804671 (TECHNOPLAST BESCHICHTUNGSGESEL [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * claim 1 * * claim 2 * * claim 5 * * claim 6 * * claim 7 *; | [DY]EP1053106 (FOLEX COATING GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * claim 1 * * claim 5 * * paragraph [0005] * * column 1, line 38 * * column 1, line 42 *; | [A]US2003131743 (SAUER ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * | by applicant | DE19804672 | DE19804671 |