EP2150039 - Method for imaging objects moving relative to each other [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basler AG An der Strusbek 60-62 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dierks, Friedrich Rantzaustr. 50 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 02 /
Kunze, Jörg Am Neuen Teich 58 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08161290.5 | 28.07.2008 | [2010/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2150039 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
H04N25/50 (EP);
H04N25/53 (EP);
H04N25/711 (EP);
H04N25/73 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bilderfassung von relativ bewegten Objekten | [2010/05] | English: | Method for imaging objects moving relative to each other | [2010/05] | French: | Procédé de saisie d'image d'objets relativement mobiles | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002060741 (KUSAKA YOSUKE [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] *; | [X]WO2005057902 (ADVASENSE TECHNOLOGIES 2004 LT [IL], et al) [X] 1-17* paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0014] , [0015] , [0065] , [0066]; figure 11 *; | [X]JP2005198148 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]US2006171694 (KAMIMURA JUNJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0027] , [0028] , [0040] - [0044]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE102006051950 | DE102007015320 |