EP2042781 - Twin Clutch Type Speed Change Control System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukada, Yoshiaki@c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Ozeki, Takashi@c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Hiroyuki@c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
Nedachi, Yoshiaki@c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
Sugita, Haruomi@c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/34] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
Tsukada, Yoshiaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Ozeki, Takashi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
Kojima, Hiroyuki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
Nedachi, Yoshiaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
Sugita, Haruomi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08161303.6 | 29.07.2008 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | JP20070249813 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007249813 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042781 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2042781 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/688, // F16D48/02, F16D11/10, F16D21/06, F16D48/06, F16H3/00 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
F16H61/688 (EP,US);
F16H61/04 (KR);
F16D11/10 (EP,US);
F16D21/06 (EP,US);
F16D25/10 (EP);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
F16H61/08 (KR);
F16D2011/008 (EP,US);
F16D2021/0661 (EP,US);
F16D2021/0692 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1086 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50684 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70282 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70406 (EP,US);
F16H2061/062 (EP,US);
F16H2306/18 (EP,US);
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H3/16 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | F16H61/688 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/50] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gangschaltsteuerungssystem für ein Doppelkupplungsgetriebe | [2009/14] | English: | Twin Clutch Type Speed Change Control System | [2009/14] | French: | Système de commande du changement de vitesse pour boîte de vitesses à double embrayage | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 26.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19751456 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 12-26 * * column 1, line 36 * * column 2, lines 19-26 * * column 2, line 29 * * column 3, lines 60-68 * * column 3, lines 32-43 * * column 4, lines 13-20 * * figures 3-5 *; | [Y]EP1617110 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102006008207 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] *; | [Y]EP1803958 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [DA]JP2007177904 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1* the whole document * | Examination | EP1770306 | EP1826053 | by applicant | DE19751456 | DE102006008207 |