EP2000048 - Toothbrush with enhanced cleaning effects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jimenez, Eduardo 21 Manor Drive Manalapan, NJ 07726 / US | 02 /
Gatzemeyer, John J 85 Rohill Road Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 03 /
Mintel, Thomas 439 Central Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
Sorrentino, Alan J 17 Adams Drive Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08161368.9 | 29.10.2004 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | US20030697213 | 30.10.2003 Original published format: US 697213 | US20040768363 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 768363 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2000048 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2000048 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A46B15/00, A46B13/02, A46B7/06, A46B9/04 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B13/00 (KR);
A46B13/02 (KR);
A46B15/00 (KR);
A46B15/0012 (EP,US);
A46B15/0032 (EP,US);
A46B3/20 (EP,US);
A46B3/22 (EP,US);
A46B5/0029 (EP,US);
A46B7/06 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A61C17/222 (EP,US);
A61C17/3463 (EP,US);
A61C17/3481 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
A46B7/08 (EP,US);
A61C17/349 (EP,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
B29L2031/425 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/50] | A46B15/00, A46B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | Zahnbürste mit verbesserter Reinigungswirkung | [2008/50] | English: | Toothbrush with enhanced cleaning effects | [2008/50] | French: | Brosse à dents dotée d'effets de nettoyage améliorés | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04796862.3 / EP1681958 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040796862) is 14.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]FR1430328 (LIMOGE M. AIMÉ) [I] 11-13 * page 1, column r; figures 8-10 * [A] 1; | [X]US5802656 (DAWSON PETER LEONARD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-15 * column 2, lines 5-16 * * column 5, lines 18-65 * * column 7, lines 56-67; figures 1,10-19,27; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE29822826U (TRISA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1,11 * page 3, lines 5-32 * * page 5, lines 19-32 ** page 6, lines 2-5; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE29916640U (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 1, lines 11-16 * * page 4, lines 18-31; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US2002124333 | US2003163881 | US2003196283 | by applicant | US1770195 | FR38440E | US2244098 | US4783869 | US5511275 | US5625916 | USRE35941E | US5970564 | US6161245 | US6311360 | US2002124333 |