EP2025871 - Centripetal turbine and internal combustion engine with such a turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vuk, Carl T. 208 Wood Smoke Road Denver, IA Iowa 50622 / US | 02 /
Whiting, Todd M. 1974 Caras Road Waterloo, IA Iowa 50701 / US | [2012/09] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
Vuk, Carl T. 208 Wood Smoke Road Denver, IA 50622 / US | ||
02 /
Whiting, Todd M. 1974 Caras Road Waterloo, IA 50701 / US | Representative(s) | John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Löser, Iris Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Löser, Iris Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08161445.5 | 30.07.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | US20070838645 | 14.08.2007 Original published format: US 838645 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2025871 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2025871 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025871 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/02, F02C6/12, F01D17/14, F01D17/18 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
F01D9/026 (EP,US);
F01D17/148 (EP,US);
F02B37/025 (EP,US);
F02C6/12 (EP,US);
F05D2220/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | F01D9/02, F01D17/14, F02C6/12, F01D17/18, F02C3/10, F01D15/10 | Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, GB [2011/52] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zentripetale Turbine und Verbrennungsmotor mit solcher Turbine | [2009/08] | English: | Centripetal turbine and internal combustion engine with such a turbine | [2009/08] | French: | Turbine centripète et moteur à combustion interne avec une telle turbine | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 21.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4008572 (WOOLLENWEBER JR WILLIAM E) [X] 1 * column 5, line 6 - line 15 * * figure 2 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US2005247058 (PEDERSEN MELVIN H [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 26 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]AT410698B (BLANK OTTO ING [AT]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 15 - line 26 * * figures 3-5 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]WO9837320 (TURBODYNE SYS INC [US]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US3614259 (NEFF JOSEPH J) [X] 1 * figure 5 * [I] 2-10; | [XI]DE10041806 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * [I] 2-10 | by applicant | AT4106B | US4512714 |