EP2149895 - A power and control unit for a low or medium voltage apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Maio, Luciano Via Gerolamo Arganini, 10 20162 Milano / IT | 02 /
De Natale, Gabriele Valentino Viale Monza, 355 20126 Milano / IT | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Giavarini, Francesco, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.r.l. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08161603.9 | 31.07.2008 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149895 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2149895 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/00 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
H01H47/002 (EP,US);
H01H71/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | Antriebs- und Steuerungseinheit für eine Nieder- oder Mittelspannungsvorrichtung | [2010/05] | English: | A power and control unit for a low or medium voltage apparatus | [2010/05] | French: | Unité d'alimentation et de commande d'un appareil de basse ou moyenne tension | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 03.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2008 | AT | 07.09.2011 | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | HR | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | NO | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | ES | 18.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
BE | 07.09.2011 | ||
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004252421 (KNOX WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0101]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2008157776 (JAFFER ADIL [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |