EP2028337 - Connection device for roller shutter providing the link between the apron and the winding shaft of the shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA 24 Rue de la Papinerie ZI Roubaix Est 59115 Leers / FR | [2009/48] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA Parc des Moulins 6 Avenue de la Créativité 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimpe, Florent 61, rue de la Baillerie 59150 Wattrelos / FR | 02 /
Goutant, Philippe 13, rue Jules Boucly 59198 Haspres / FR | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [2011/45] |
Former [2009/09] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 08161664.1 | 01.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | FR20070057118 | 21.08.2007 Original published format: FR 0757118 | [2009/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028337 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028337 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/171, E06B9/86 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
E06B9/86 (EP);
E06B9/171 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | E06B9/171 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/44] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kupplungsvorrichtung für Jalousie, die eine Verbindung zwischen der Jalousie und der Aufrollwelle der Jalousie ermöglicht | [2009/09] | English: | Connection device for roller shutter providing the link between the apron and the winding shaft of the shutter | [2009/09] | French: | Dispositif d'attelage pour volet roulant permettant la liaison entre le tablier et l'arbre d'enroulement du volet | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2696779 (PEYRICHOU FERMETURES HENRI [FR]) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0937859 (ZURFLUH FELLER [FR]) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US1776119 (JOHNSON HOWARD A) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4633927 (LABELLE H M ROBERT [CA]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-5 * | Examination | WO2009013414 | by applicant | FR2696779 | EP0937859 | EP0937859 |