EP1981290 - Method and apparatus for encoding/decoding video data to implement local three-dimensional video [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Dae-sik 824-706 Woosung Apt., 973-3 Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jung, Choon-sik 106-406 Hanseungmi Mate Apt., 158-119 Songsan-ri Taean-eup, Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Suk-ki 304-1306 LG Xi Apt., Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Bray, Richard Anthony Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2008/42] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08161703.7 | 28.06.2006 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | KR20050059485 | 02.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050059485 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981290 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1981290 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N5/76, H04N21/83 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,US);
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/42] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2013/41] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodierung von Videodaten zur Erzeugung lokaler dreidimensionaler Videobilder | [2010/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for encoding/decoding video data to implement local three-dimensional video | [2008/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de codage et décodage pour des données d'image mettant en oeuvre la vidéo tridimensionelle | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/42] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung/Dekodierung von Videodaten zur Implementierung dreidimensionaler Videoinhalte | ||
Former [2008/42] | Procédé et appareil de codage/décodage de données vidéo pour mettre en ýuvre une vidéo tridimensionnelle locale | Examination procedure | 04.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06116251.7 / EP1739979 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060116251) is 12.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1205931 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] , [0020] , [0021] , [0025] , [0036]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO2004036906 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0073] *; | [X]JP2005006114 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | Examination | US6763390 | CN1549228 | by applicant | EP1394593 | GB20010029992 |