EP2154933 - LED reading light and method for operating an LED reading light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Lighting Systems GmbH Bertramstrasse 8 59557 Lippstadt / DE | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röbke, Steffen Ansgarstrasse 10A 33098 Paderborn / DE | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Hilleringmann, Jochen Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08162408.2 | 14.08.2008 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154933 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154933 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
H05B45/37 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP);
Y02B20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/42] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LED-Leseleuchte und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer LED-Leseleuchte | [2010/07] | English: | LED reading light and method for operating an LED reading light | [2010/07] | French: | Lampe de lecture DEL et procédé de fonctionnement d'une lampe de lecture DEL | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 17.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1411750 (CCS INC [JP]) [X] 1-5 * columns 5-8; figures 8,12 *; | [A]EP1244334 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-5 * columns 2-5; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1379108 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * columns 2-4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1517588 (MORITEX CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * columns 4-9; figures 1,5 * |