EP2153884 - Gas delivery method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tassel, Andrew Duncan 16 Overton Hill London Road Overton, Hampshire RG25 3PD / GB | 02 /
Downie, Neil Alexander Sunnyside Potbridge Road Odiham, Hampshire RG29 1JN / GB | 03 /
Wiktorowicz, Richard 16 Nash Close Stoke Grange Aylesbury, Buckinghampshire HP21 9YB / GB | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 08162454.6 | 15.08.2008 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153884 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/02 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B01F23/10 (EP,US);
B01F25/313 (EP,US);
B01F25/31324 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0329 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/42] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gaslieferverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2010/07] | English: | Gas delivery method and device | [2010/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'approvisionnement de gaz | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH563807 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE) [X] 10-15 * column 5, line 46 - column 5, line 66; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1586369 (SCHERRER INST PAUL [CH], et al) [X] 10-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE19645695 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO02070116 (PARSONS AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0028209 (SMIDAK EMIL F) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0028209 |