EP1993158 - Fuel cell gas separator, manufacturing method thereof, and fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2008/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakata, Hiromichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Yokoi, Masayoshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Onishi, Masazumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Aihara, Hideo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Murate, Masashi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Kaji, Yoshifumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08162580.8 | 12.03.2001 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000068553 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000068553 | JP20000169897 | 07.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000169897 | JP20010058173 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001058173 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993158 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1993158 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
H01M8/0206 (EP,US);
H01M8/0204 (EP,US);
H01M8/0221 (EP,US);
H01M8/0226 (EP,US);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
H01M8/0254 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (US);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/2483 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gasabscheider für Brennstoffzellen, Herstellungsverfahren dafür und Brennstoffzelle | [2008/47] | English: | Fuel cell gas separator, manufacturing method thereof, and fuel cell | [2008/47] | French: | Séparateur de gaz de pile à combustible, son procédé de fabrication et pile à combustible | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 21.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01106038.1 / EP1137089 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010106038) is 26.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0955686 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0034] - [0043] * [Y] 1-9; | [E]EP1148566 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] - [0021] - [0041] - [0104] *; | [A]US4605602 (FEIGENBAUM HAIM [IL], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, lines 44-67 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 13 * * column 6, lines 22-64 *; | [Y]JPH11126622 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] - [0014] * * figure 2 *; | [A]JPH11126621 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]JPH11144744 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS60115173 | EP1137089 |