EP2030691 - Husking-roll driving device in hull remover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Satake Corporation 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koreda, Minoru c/o SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 02 /
Yorioka, Seiji c/o SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 03 /
Ikuta, Chozaburo c/o SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Koreda, Minoru c/o SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
Yorioka, Seiji c/o SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | |||
03 /
Ikuta, Chozaburo c/o SATAKE CORPORATION 7-2, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake 5th fl. Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08163048.5 | 27.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | JP20070224704 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007224704 | JP20080170580 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008170580 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030691 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2030691 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030691 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B02B3/04 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
B02B3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, IT, TR [2013/22] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schälwalzen-Antriebsvorrichtung in einem Schalenentfernungsgerät | [2009/10] | English: | Husking-roll driving device in hull remover | [2009/10] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement des rouleaux d'un décortiqueur | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 27.03.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 12.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006249037 (KOREDA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | JPS6229064 | JPH03106452 | JPH03137945 | JP2001038230 | JP2006312151 |