EP2031856 - IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/10] | Image decoding apparatus and method | ||
[2018/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horikoshi, Hiroki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2018/43] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
Horikoshi, Hiroki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [2018/43] |
Former [2009/36] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park GB-Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08163343.0 | 29.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | JP20070226704 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007226704 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031856 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031856 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/41, H04N1/417 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/41 (EP,US);
H04N1/4175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/43] |
Former [2009/46] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2018/25] | English: | IMAGE DECODING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2018/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÈDÈ DE DECODAGE D'IMAGE | [2018/25] |
Former [2009/10] | Bildcodierungsvorrichtung und Verfahren | ||
Former [2009/10] | Image decoding apparatus and method | ||
Former [2009/10] | Dispositif et procédé de décodage d'image | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 07.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.10.2018 | [2019/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0229379 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH02237375 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]US5008951 (KOSHI YUTAKA [JP]); | [Y]EP0753830 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1,6 * column 10, line 49 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A] - HITOSHI HORIE ET AL, "FACSIMILE IMAGE HIGH-SPEED CODING AND DECODING PROCESSOR", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19941001), vol. 77, no. 10, ISSN 8756-6621, pages 21 - 37, XP000491483 | Examination | JPH11112818 | JP2001211079 | JP2007214813 | US2007217704 | by applicant | JP3083493B | JP2002223360 |