EP2033835 - SECURE DEVICE FOR DETECTING ELECTRIC BRAKING INSUFFICIENCY AND SWITCHING TO A SECURE BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/11] | Secure device for detecting electric braking insufficiency and switching to a secure brake | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48, rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2019/17] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | ||
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 3, avenue André Malraux 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport SA 3, avenue André Malraux 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jobard, Thierry 14 rue Pailleron 69004 Lyon / FR | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/17] |
Former [2009/11] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08163386.9 | 01.09.2008 | [2009/11] | Priority number, date | FR20070057341 | 04.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757341 | [2009/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2033835 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2033835 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2033835 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60L7/06, H02P3/22, H02P6/24, B60L3/00, B60L7/00, B60L7/22 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H02P6/24 (EP,US);
B61H11/00 (KR);
B60L3/0076 (EP,US);
B60L7/003 (EP,US);
B60L7/06 (EP,US);
B60L7/22 (EP,US);
B61H9/00 (KR);
H02P3/22 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | B60L7/06, H02P3/22, H02P6/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON MÄNGELN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN BREMSE UND ZUR WEITERSCHALTUNG AUF EINE SICHERHEITSBREMSE | [2018/50] | English: | SECURE DEVICE FOR DETECTING ELECTRIC BRAKING INSUFFICIENCY AND SWITCHING TO A SECURE BRAKE | [2018/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF SÉCURITAIRE DE DÉTECTION D'INSUFFISANCE DE FREINAGE ÉLECTRIQUE ET DE COMMUTATION SUR UN FREIN SÉCURITAIRE | [2018/50] |
Former [2009/11] | Sicherheitsvorrichtung zur Erfassung von Mängeln einer elektrischen Bremse und zur Weiterschaltung auf eine Sicherheitsbremse | ||
Former [2009/11] | Secure device for detecting electric braking insufficiency and switching to a secure brake | ||
Former [2009/11] | Dispositif sécuritaire de détection d'insuffisance de freinage électrique et de commutation sur un frein sécuritaire | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 16.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2008 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | IE | 01.09.2019 | LU | 01.09.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.09.2008 | |
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH08149870 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,14,17,18 * abstract * [Y] 2,9 [I] 6,10-13,15,16; | [Y]US6445879 (YOUN SANG CHUL [KR], et al) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]WO03049256 (ISKRA WIND TURBINE MANUFACTURE [GB], et al) [A] 1,17* abstract *; | [Y]US2007090783 (RAINER JOSEF [AU], et al) [Y] 9 * column 2, paragraph 18; figure 2 * |