EP2037700 - Miniature microphone assembly with hydrophobic surface coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epcos Pte Ltd 166 Kallang Way Singapore 349249 / SG | [2011/02] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Pulse MEMS ApS Byleddet 12-14 4000 Roskilde / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Christian Udbygade 7, 1. th. 2200 Copenhagen / DK | 02 /
Rehder, Jörg Ryvej 09 2830 Virum / DK | 03 /
Johansen, Leif Steen Veksøvej 4B, 1. tv. 2700 Brønshøj / DK | 04 /
Scheel, Peter Ulrik Fennevangen, 22 2820 Gentofte / DK | [2014/18] |
Former [2014/04] | 01 /
Wang, Christian Udbygade 7, 1. th. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
02 /
Rehder, Jörg Ryvej 09 2830 Virum / DK | |||
03 /
Johansen, Leif Steen Veksøvej 4B, 1. tv. 2700 Brønshøj / DK | |||
04 /
Scheel, Peter Ulrik Fennevangen, 22 2820 Gentofte / DK | |||
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
Wang, Christian Udbygade 7, 1. th. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
02 /
Rehder, Jörg Ryvej, 09 2830 Virum / DK | |||
03 /
Johansen, Leif Steen Veksøvej 4B, 1. tv. 2700 Brønshøj / DK | |||
04 /
Scheel, Peter Ulrik Fennevangen, 22 2820 Gentofte / DK | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [2014/18] |
Former [2009/33] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 08163570.8 | 03.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | US20070993466P | 12.09.2007 Original published format: US 993466 P | US20080130524P | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 130524 P | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037700 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037700 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2037700 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04R19/00, H04R19/04, H04R31/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H04R31/00 (EP,US);
H04R19/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04R19/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04R31/006 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2201/003 (KR);
Y10T29/49005 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | H04R19/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2011/50] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Miniaturmikrofonanordnung mit wasserabweisender Oberflächenbeschichtung | [2009/12] | English: | Miniature microphone assembly with hydrophobic surface coating | [2009/12] | French: | Ensemble de microphone miniature avec revêtement de surface hydrophobe | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 07.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5889871 (DOWNS JR EDWARD F [US]) [Y] 1-22 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6178249 (HIETANEN JARMO [FI], et al) [Y] 1-22 * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 0; figures 2,4 *; | [Y]WO02098166 (SONIONMEMS AS [DK], et al) [Y] 9-11,13,22 * page 2, line 19 - page 7, line 16 *; | [Y]US6522762 (MULLENBORN MATTHIAS [DK], et al) [Y] 20,21 * column 5, line 31 - line 36; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1432281 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A] - HAYWARD R BAKER ET AL, "Surface Electrical Leakage on Insulators and Coatings in the Presence of Moisture Condensation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE, US, (19760901), vol. EI-1, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9367, pages 76 - 80, XP011162181 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2006096005 | US2006237806 | EP1821570 | WO2007112743 | WO2008077517 |