EP2034234 - Lighting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Masaru Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Schinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Keiichi Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | 03 /
Hashimto, Sumio Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | 04 /
Otake, Hirokazu Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | 05 /
Nishiie, Mitsuhiko Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | 06 /
Hiramatsu, Takuro Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | 07 /
Kumagai, Masatoshi Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | [2011/49] |
Former [2009/11] | 01 /
Inoue, Masaru Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Schinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimizu, Keiichi Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | |||
03 /
Hashimto, Sumio Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | |||
04 /
Otake, Hirokazu Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | |||
05 /
Nishiie, Mitsuhiko Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | |||
06 /
Hiramatsu, Takuro Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | |||
07 /
Kumagai, Masatoshi Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 3-1, Higashishinagawa 4-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8640 / JP | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2009/11] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street GB-Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08163696.1 | 04.09.2008 | [2009/11] | Priority number, date | JP20070230701 | 05.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007230701 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2034234 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2034234 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/04, F21K99/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
F21S8/026 (EP,US);
F21V17/12 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21V7/0083 (EP,US);
F21V23/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/11] | F21S8/04, F21K7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/47] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | [2009/11] | English: | Lighting apparatus | [2009/11] | French: | Appareil d'éclairage | [2009/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 12.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.12.2011 | ES | 18.03.2012 | GB | 04.09.2012 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/34] | IT | 07.12.2011 | |
GB | 04.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | IT | 07.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1818607 (KABUSHIKIKAISHA MIRAI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-17 * [Y] 4; | [XA]US2007121328 (MONDLOCH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 2 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2,4 * [A] 1,3,4; | [X]US7241019 (TSAI HSI-HSIEN [TW], et al) [X] 2 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 10; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP1722158 (ERCO LEUCHTEN [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0062]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2006172895 | US2007121328 | EP1818607 |