EP2040165 - Workflow-enabled client [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2020/15] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhodes, Bradley J.@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 02 /
Chemishkian, Sergey@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 03 /
Schwartz, Edward@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 04 /
Phillips, Daja@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 05 /
McFarland, Max E.@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 06 /
Mariotti, Andrea@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 07 /
Haixia, Yu@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 08 /
Griffin, Michael G.E.@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 09 /
Savitzky, Stephen R.@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 10 /
Wolff, Gregory@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | 11 /
Case, Patty@c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | [2020/15] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Rhodes, Bradley J. c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | ||
02 /
Chemishkian, Sergey c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
03 /
Schwartz, Edward c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
04 /
Phillips, Daja c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
05 /
McFarland, Max E. c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
06 /
Mariotti, Andrea c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
07 /
Haixia, Yu c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
08 /
Griffin, Michael G.E. c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
09 /
Savitzky, Stephen R. c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
10 /
Wolff, Gregory c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | |||
11 /
Case, Patty c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025-7054 / US | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2009/13] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08163946.0 | 09.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | US20070972562P | 14.09.2007 Original published format: US 972562 P | US20080135706 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 135706 | US20080135715 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 135715 | US20080135725 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 135725 | US20080135735 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 135735 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040165 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2040165 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040165 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
G06F9/5027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2020/15] |
Former [2011/11] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Workflow-fähiger Client | [2009/13] | English: | Workflow-enabled client | [2009/13] | French: | Client habilité pour le flux de travail | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 28.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | [2021/09] |
Former [2020/48] | NL | 08.04.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001030766 (YAMAMOTO MASAHITO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [I] - "JINI ARCHITECTURAL OVERVIEW", INTERNET CITATION, (199901), URL: http://www.sun.com/software/jini/whitepapers/architecture.pdf, (19990101), XP002217546 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - "THE JINI PRINT SERVICE API. DRAFT STANDARD VERSION 1.0", INTERNET CITATION, (20000523), URL: http://www.jini.org/files/specs/print-api/overview-summary.html, (20100504), XP007912924 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - RAJA NAGENDRA KUMAR ET AL, "Aladdin - The Jini Service Browser", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS.PROCEEDINGS NCC, XX, XX, (20000129), pages 100 - 108, XP007912926 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - SUN MICROSYSTEMS, "Jini (TM) Device Architecture Specification", INTERNET CITATION, (19990125), URL: http://www-rohan.sdsu.edu/doc/jini/doc/specs/device-arch/deviceArch.pdf, (20001120), XP002153332 | - WALDO J ET AL, "The Jini Technology-Enabled Surrogate Architecture - TS-984", JAVAONE SUN'S WORLDWIDE JAVA DEVELOPER CONFERENCE, XX, XX, (20000607), pages 2 - 21, XP002269427 | - GAMMA E ED - GAMMA E ET AL, Design Patterns, Elements of Reusable Object-Oriented-Software, Visitor Pattern, Structural Patterns, DESIGN PATTERNS : ELEMENTS OF REUSABLE OBJECT-ORIENTED SOFTWARE; [ADDISON-WESLEY PROFESSIONAL COMPUTING SERIES], ADDISON-WESLEY, BOSTON, MASS. [U.A.], PAGE(S) 207 - 217, (20050401), ISBN 978-0-201-63361-0, XP002543513 | by applicant | US2006010095 |