EP2163915 - Method of determining at least one axis on which a mobile device moves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Géomatic Ingénierie S.A. Chemin des Croisettes 26 1066 Epalinges / CH | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pilet, Thierry Ch. du Collège 1867 Ollon / CH | 02 /
Luginbühl, Etienne rue du Milieu 20 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2010/11] | Application number, filing date | 08164359.5 | 15.09.2008 | [2010/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2163915 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
G01S5/02521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/47] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung mindestens einer Achse, auf der sich eine mobile Apparatur bewegt | [2010/11] | English: | Method of determining at least one axis on which a mobile device moves | [2010/11] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'au moins un axe sur lequel se déplace un équipement mobile | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005020278 (KRUMM JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1-11* paragraphs [0010] , [0046] - [0059]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2008122695 (WANG JACKSON KIT [CA], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016] , [0060] , [0063] , [0093]; figures 1a,1b,2 * |