EP2000799 - ANALYSIS DEVICE FOR ANALYSING A SAMPLE ON A TEST ELEMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/50] | Analysis device for analysing a sample on a test element | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/34] |
Former [2008/50] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riebel, Stefan Wolfhartstrasse 44 67069, Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Wieder, Herbert Lauffener Strasse 1 68259, Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Bainczyk, Gregor Siegfriedstrasse 42 68199, Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Augstein, Manfred Rotannenweg 13 68305, Mannheim / DE | 05 /
Grosser, Albert Kluserstrasse 10 58511, Lüdenscheid / DE | 06 /
Kube, Oliver Kranzbühlerstrasse 7 67547, Worms / DE | 07 /
Meinecke, Dieter Braustrasse 5 68309, Mannheim / DE | 08 /
Thös, Bruno Im Herrschaftsland 21 66287, Quierschied / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
Riebel, Stefan Wolfhartstrasse 44 67069, Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
Wieder, Herbert Lauffener Strasse 1 68259, Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
Bainczyk, Gregor Siegfriedstrasse 42 68199, Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
Augstein, Manfred Rotannenweg 13 68305, Mannheim / DE | |||
05 /
Grosser, Albert Kluserstrasse 10 58511, Lüdenscheid / DE | |||
06 /
Kube, Oliver Kranzbühlerstrasse 7 67547, Worms / DE | |||
07 /
Meinecke, Dieter Braustrasse 5 68309, Mannheim / DE | |||
08 /
Thös, Bruno Im Herrschaftsland 21 66287, Quierschied / DE | |||
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Riebel, Stefan Wolfhartstrasse 44 67069, Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
Wieder, Herbert Lauffener Strasse 1 68259, Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
Bainczyk, Gregor Siegfriedstrasse 42 68199, Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
Augstein, Manfred Rotannenweg 13 68305, Mannheim / DE | |||
05 /
Grosser, Albert Kluserstrasse 10 58511, Lüdenscheid / DE | |||
06 /
Kube, Oliver Kranzbühlerstrasse 7 67547, Worms / DE | |||
07 /
Meinecke, Dieter Braustrasse 5 68309, Mannheim / DE | |||
08 /
Thös, Bruno Im Herrschaftsland 21 66287, Quierschied / DE | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Stößel, Matthias Herzog Fiesser & Partner Bad Kreuznacher Straße 27-29 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08164426.2 | 25.10.2005 | [2008/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2000799 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2000799 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, G01N33/50 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/48785 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2008/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANALYSEGERÄT ZUR ANALYSE EINER PROBE AUF EINEM TESTELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GERÄTS | [2016/11] | English: | ANALYSIS DEVICE FOR ANALYSING A SAMPLE ON A TEST ELEMENT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE DEVICE | [2016/11] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANAYSE DESTINE A L'ANALYSE D'UN ECHANTILLON SUR UN ELEMENT DE TEST ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DUDIT APPAREIL | [2016/11] |
Former [2008/50] | Analysegerät zur Analyse einer Probe auf einem Testelement | ||
Former [2008/50] | Analysis device for analysing a sample on a test element | ||
Former [2008/50] | Appareil d'analyse destiné à l'analyse d'un échantillon sur un élément de test | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05023219.8 / EP1780541 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050023219) is 30.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2005 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | AT | 25.10.2016 | IE | 25.10.2016 | LU | 25.10.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.10.2005 | |
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 25.10.2016 | ||
IE | 25.10.2016 | ||
LU | 25.10.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
AT | 25.10.2016 | ||
IE | 25.10.2016 | ||
LU | 25.10.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.10.2016 | ||
LU | 25.10.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 25.10.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8502257 (SENTECH MEDICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19 * page 19, line 27 - page 20, line 15 *; | [A]EP0732590 (BAYER AG [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 4; figure 9 * * column 8, lines 1-43 * * column 9, line 5 - column 11, line 2 * * column 12, lines 11-24 * * column 14, lines 7-28 * * column 16, lines 14-19 *; | [A]WO9702487 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10255325 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0014] *; | [A] - FRANK PÖHLAU, "Räumliche Schaltungsträger- Rationalisieren durch Integration", SIEMENS- WEBZINE, no. 1/1997, (20010212), pages 1 - 6, URL: w4.siemens.de/ful/en/archiv/zeitschrift/heft1_97/artikel10/index.htlm, (20060326), XP002374386 [A] 1-19 * pages 1-3 * | [A] - PENTON MEDIA, "Molded Interconnect Devices reshape electromechanical design", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, (20000905), pages 1 - 7, URL: www.elecdesign.com/Articles/print.cfm?ArticleID=4693, (20060324), XP002374387 [A] 1-19 * page 1 * | [A] - DAVID C. FRISCH, "Circuitry in Three Dimensions: Multifunctional Molded Plastic Packages", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (199106), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 442 - 446, XP002374388 [A] 1-19 * pages 442,443 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.81824 | [A] - FELDMANN K ET AL, "New Requirements And Solutions For Product Data Processing Of Three-dimensional Molded Interconnection Devices", 1992 IEEE INT. ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY SYMP., (19920928), pages 94 - 99, XP010259394 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4654197 | US5108564 | EP0618443 | WO9702487 | EP0821233 | EP0821234 | DE19717882 | EP0505475 | DE19753847 | DE19854316 | WO0019185 | DE19902601 | WO0067982 | WO0148461 | DE10359160 |