EP1994889 - Devices for percutaneous tissue retraction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/48] | Devices for percutaneous tissue retraction | ||
[2016/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Maurice M. 9285 Oak Knoll Cove Cordova, TN 38018 / US | 02 /
Foley, Kevin T. 2877 Keasler Circle West Germantown, TN 38139 / US | 03 /
Roehm, Thomas E. III 122 Morningside Park Memphis, TN 38104 / US | 04 /
Lim, Roy K. 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, TN 38138 / US | 05 /
FESSLER, Richard G. 1314 Trapp Lane Winnetka, IL 60093 / US | [2017/04] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Smith, Maurice M. 9285 Oak Knoll Cove Cordova, TN TN 38018 / US | ||
02 /
Foley, Kevin T. 2877 Keasler Circle West Germantown, TN TN 38139 / US | |||
03 /
Roehm, Thomas E. III 122 Morningside Park Memphis TN 38104 / US | |||
04 /
Lim, Roy K. 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, TN TN 38138 / US | |||
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
Smith, Maurice M 9285 Oak Knoll Cove Cordova, TN TN 38018 / US | ||
02 /
Foley, Kevin T 2877 Keasler Circle West Germantown, TN TN 38139 / US | |||
03 /
Roehm, Thomas E III 122 Morningside Park Memphis TN 38104 / US | |||
04 /
Lim, Roy K 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, TN TN 38138 / US | |||
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
Smith, Maurice M 9285 Oak Knoll Cove Cordova, TN TN 38018 / US | ||
02 /
Foley, Kevin T 2877 Keasler Circle West Germantown, TN TN 38139 / US | |||
03 /
Roehm, Thomas E III 122 Morningside Park Memphis TN 38104 / US | |||
04 /
Lim, Roy K 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, TN TN 38138 / US | |||
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
Smith, Maurice M 9285 Oak Knoll Cove Cordova, TN TN 38018 / US | ||
02 /
Foley, Kevin T 2877 Keasler Circle West Germantown, TN TN 38139 / US | |||
03 /
Roehm, Thomas E III PO Box 1372 Branden, TN TN 38010 / US | |||
04 /
Lim, Roy K 7273 Great Oaks Road Germantown, TN TN 38138 / US | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08164466.8 | 02.04.2003 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | US20020117440 | 05.04.2002 Original published format: US 117440 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1994889 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1994889 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994889 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/02, // A61B17/28 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
A61B17/0293 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (KR);
A61B1/32 (US);
A61B17/02 (KR,US);
A61B17/3439 (EP,US);
A61B17/0206 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/48] | A61B17/02, A61B17/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zur perkutanen Retraktion von Gewebe | [2008/48] | English: | Devices for percutaneous tissue retraction | [2016/46] | French: | Dispositifs de rétraction percutanée tissulaire | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/48] | Devices for percutaneous tissue retraction | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03746580.4 / EP1494592 | Divisional application(s) | EP10180674.3 / EP2258276 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030746580) is 26.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2003 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | ES | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | IE | 02.04.2017 | LU | 02.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | GB | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.04.2003 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 02.04.2017 | ||
LU | 02.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.04.2003 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 02.04.2017 | ||
LU | 02.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 02.04.2017 | ||
LU | 02.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GB | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
LU | 02.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US52014 (BARTLETT) [X] 1,2,17 * the whole document *; | [X]US3044461 (BARBARA MURDOCK) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8303189 (LASERSCOPE INC [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,7 *; | [XA]DE4115548 (STORZ KARL [DE]) [X] 1,2,17 * column 3, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 * [A] 3; | [A]US2001049498 (DAVISON THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 3* figures 6,7 *; | [PX]US2002173798 (DIPOTO GENE P [US]) [PX] 1 * paragraphs [0069] , [0077]; figure 11 * | Examination | US1222478 | WO9728753 | US6048309 |