EP2039879 - Apparatus and methods for running liners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford Technology Holdings, LLC 2000, St. James Place Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX 77056 / US | ||
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ring, Lev 14122 Barnhart Boulevard Houston, TX 77077 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
RING, Lev 14122 Barnhart Boulevard Houston, TX 77077 / US | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08164568.1 | 18.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | US20070973438P | 18.09.2007 Original published format: US 973438 P | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039879 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039879 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/14, E21B43/10, E21B33/126 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
E21B43/105 (EP,US);
E21B23/08 (EP,US);
E21B33/126 (EP,US);
E21B34/142 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | E21B34/14, E21B43/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, NO [2011/51] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Einführen von Auskleidungen | [2009/13] | English: | Apparatus and methods for running liners | [2009/13] | French: | Appareil et procédés pour descendre des crépines | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP11184929.5 / EP2407635 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO02097234 (DRIL QUIP INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 4,5; | [X]US2003196818 (LYNDE GERALD D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004055786 (MAGUIRE PATRICK G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-10 * paragraphs [0062] - [0074]; figures 1,8-11 * * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004027205 (ENVENTURE GLOBAL TECHNLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11-14 * the whole document * * figures 1-3,8-10,17,18 *; | [A]WO2004031527 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]GB2399580 (ENVENTURE GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007107941 (FILLIPOV ANDREI G [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * the whole document *; | [X]GB2435280 (ENVENTURE GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,15 * figures 2-4 * * the whole document * |