EP2068591 - Mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Masanori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Tezuka, Yasuo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Miyazaki, Nao c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Motohashi, Kayo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2017/29] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
Hashimoto, Masanori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Tezuka, Yasuo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Miyazaki, Nao c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Motohashi, Kayo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Schultes, Stephan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2009/24] | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08164931.1 | 23.09.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070313690 | 04.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007313690 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068591 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2068591 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068591 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/02, H04W36/18 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
H04W36/02 (EP,US);
H04W36/00695 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | H04W36/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/32] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationssystem | [2009/24] | English: | Mobile communication system | [2009/24] | French: | Système de communication mobile | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 01.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.08.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1441480 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | [YA]WO2006102650 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006135185 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | by applicant | JP2006080690 | JP2007104344 |