EP2014159 - Pest control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/03] | Pest control device and method | ||
[2015/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Whitmire Micro-Gen Research Laboratories, Inc. 3568 Tree Ct. Industrial Blvd. St. Louis, MO 63122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cink, James H. 1003 Saint Paul Run Ballwin, MO 3021 / US | 02 /
Simms, Steven R. 1973 Rule Avenue Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | 03 /
Berger, Jonathan D. 12437 Nicholas Lane St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | 04 /
White, Lee M.@c/o Whitmire Micro-Gen Research Laboratories, Inc. 3568 Tree Court Industrial Boulevard St Louis, Missouri 63122 / US | 05 /
Moran, Wayne H. 601 Arbor Glen Court Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | 06 /
Martin Sr., Jeffery A 1742 Warmington Court Manchester, MO 63021 / US | [2015/32] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Cink, James H. 1003 Saint Paul Run Ballwin, MO 3021 / US | ||
02 /
Simms, Steven R. 1973 Rule Avenue Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | |||
03 /
Berger, Jonathan D. 12437 Nicholas Lane St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | |||
04 /
White, Lee M. c/o Whitmire Micro-Gen Research Laboratories, Inc. 3568 Tree Court Industrial Boulevard St Louis, Missouri 63122 / US | |||
05 /
Moran, Wayne H. 601 Arbor Glen Court Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
06 /
Martin Sr., Jeffery A 1742 Warmington Court Manchester, MO 63021 / US | |||
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
Cink, James H. 1003 Saint Paul Run Ballwin, MO 3021 / US | ||
02 /
Simms, Steven R. 1973 Rule Avenue Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | |||
03 /
Berger, Jonathan D. 12437 Nicholas Lane St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | |||
04 /
White, Lee M. 202 Morewood Drive Manchester, MO 63011 / US | |||
05 /
Moran, Wayne H. 601 Arbor Glen Court Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
06 /
Martin Sr., Jeffery A 1742 Warmington Court Manchester, MO 63021 / US | |||
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
Cink, James H. 1003 Saint Paul Run Ballwin, MO 3021 / US | ||
02 /
Simms, Steven R. 1973 Rule Avenue Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | |||
03 /
Berger, Jonathan D. 12437 Nicholas Lane St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | |||
04 /
White, Lee M. 202 Morewood Drive Manchester, MO 63011 / US | |||
05 /
Moran, Wayne H. 601 Arbor Glen Court Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
06 /
Martin Sr., Jeffery A 1742 Warmington Court Manchester, MO 63021 / US | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/03] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165312.3 | 24.03.2004 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | US20030400773 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: US 400773 | US20040805802 | 22.03.2004 Original published format: US 805802 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2014159 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2014159 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014159 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01M1/20, A01M1/02 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A01M1/2011 (EP,US);
A01M1/026 (EP,US);
A01M2200/011 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | A01M1/02, A01M1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schädlingssteuervorrichtung | [2015/03] | English: | Pest control device | [2015/03] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de nuisibles | [2015/03] |
Former [2009/03] | Schädlingssteuervorrichtung und -verfahren | ||
Former [2009/03] | Pest control device and method | ||
Former [2009/03] | Dispositif et procédé de contrôle de nuisibles | Examination procedure | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04251679.9 / EP1462001 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040251679) is 22.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 30.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2004 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | GB | 24.03.2016 | IE | 24.03.2016 | LU | 24.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 24.03.2004 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 24.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.03.2004 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 24.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
GB | 24.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
GR | 06.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6003266 (WOODRUFF KEITH F [US]) [A] 1,6,9 * figure 1 *; | [X]US6016625 (BISHOFF MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4 - column 11; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US2002023382 (SNELL ERIC J [US], et al) [X] 6,9,10 * page 4 - page 5; figures 3,6 * [A] 1; | [A]US6439069 (CATES JERRY [US]) [A] 1,6,9* column 19 - column 21; figure 3 * | by applicant | US6016625 | US2002023382 |