EP2056188 - Touch display device and method of determining touch mode thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASUSTeK Computer Inc. No. 150, Li-Te Road Peitou Taipei 112 / TW | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Kuan-Lin 4F, No. 150, LI-TE Rd., PEI TOU District 112, Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Hsieh, Ming-Chih 4F, No. 150, LI-TE Rd., PEI TOU District 112, Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Lin, Chu-Hui 4F, No. 150, LI-TE Rd., PEI TOU District 112, Taipei City / TW | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08165386.7 | 29.09.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | TW20070140769 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: TW 96140769 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2056188 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2056188 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/045, G06F3/041 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/045 (EP,US);
G06F3/04164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | Berührungsanzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Berührungsmodus davon | [2009/19] | English: | Touch display device and method of determining touch mode thereof | [2009/19] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage tactile et procédé de détermination de son mode tactile | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9210823 (ASHER DAVID J [US]) [I] 1-17 * page 1, line 5 - line 15 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 11 - line 20 * * page 11 - page 12; figure 1 * * page 15, line 12 - line 28; figure 6 * * page 17, line 14 - page 19, line 20; figures 12,13 * * page 25, line 22 - page 27, line 4; figure 20 *; | [I]WO9806079 (INTERLINK ELECTRONICS [US]) [I] 1-17 * page 9, line 1 - line 16 * * page 19, line 19 - page 29, line 31; figures 5-11c * * page 31, line 19 - line 27 * * page 33, line 15 - page 34, line 28; figure 14 *; | [I]EP0194861 (ELOGRAPHICS INC [US]) [I] 1-17 * page 15, line 27 - page 17, line 15; figure 1 * * page 17, line 17 - page 18, line 10; figure 2 * * page 20, line 15 - page 23, line 4; figure 4 * * page 23, line 15 - line 34; figure 5 * * page 24, line 25 - page 25, line 16 *; | [I]US4933660 (WYNNE JR JAMES R [US]) [I] 1-17 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 57; figures 2-5 *; | [I]WO02069124 (TOUCH CO LTD A [KR], et al) [I] 1-17 * page 12, line 10 - page 17, line 35; figures 9-13 * | [XI] - JÖRN LOVISCACH ED - ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, "TwoFinger Input with a Standard Touch Screen", UIST 2007. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 20TH. ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY, OCTOBER 7 10, 2007, NEWPORT, RHODE ISLAND, USA; [ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20071007), ISBN 978-1-59593-679-2, pages 169 - 172, XP007912790 [X] 8-17 * the whole document * [I] 1-7 | [I] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC, "TOUCH SCREEN CONTROLLER. ADS7846", INTERNET CITATION, (20050127), page 29PP, URL: http://focus.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/ads7846.pdf, (20100421), XP007912759 [I] 1-17 * page 1 * * page 9 - page 10; figures 1-5 * * section "PRESSURE MEASUREMENT"; page 12; figure 8 * | [I] - ATMEL, "AVR341: Four and Five-wire Touch Screen Controller", ATMEL APPLICATION NOTE,, (20070701), pages 1 - 19, URL: http://www.atmel.com/dyn/resources/prod_documents/doc8091.pdf, (20100421), XP007912763 [I] 1-17 * page 1 - page 5; figures 2-1,2-2,2-3 * |