EP2063108 - System and method for optimizing wake interaction between wind turbines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vyas, Parag Mitterwieserstr. 4 80797, Munich / DE | 02 /
Aalburg, Christian Hesseloherstrasse 9 80802, Munich / DE | 03 /
Anbarasu, Arungalai A104, Millenium Habitat Brookefields Kundalahalli 560037, Bangalore / IN | 04 /
Gujjar, Vineel Chandrakanth No. 33, 1 B Main Road N R Layout Konena Agrahara, HAL 560017, Bangalore / IN | 05 /
Cardinal, Mark Edward 6020 Gardner Road Altamont, NY 12009 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165452.7 | 30.09.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | US20070872762 | 16.10.2007 Original published format: US 872762 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063108 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063108 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/00, F03D9/00, F03D7/04 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
F03D7/0292 (EP,US);
F03D7/047 (EP,US);
F03D7/048 (EP,US);
F05B2270/204 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | F03D7/00, F03D9/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/33] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Optimierung der Wirbelstrominteraktion zwischen Windturbine | [2009/22] | English: | System and method for optimizing wake interaction between wind turbines | [2009/22] | French: | Système et procédé d'optimisation d'interaction de sillage entre les éoliennes | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2004111446 (ENERGIEONDERZOEK CT NEDERLAND [NL], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 15 * * page 5, line 19 - line 24 * * page 11, line 1 - line 24 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,6; | [X]DE102004056254 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0014] , [0025] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] * * figures 2,8 *; | [X]EP1790851 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0009] , [0010] , [0014] , [0017] , [0019] , [0021] , [0022] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102005033229 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0003] , [0004] , [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0013] , [0029] * * figures 1,2,3 *; | [A] - MILBORROW D J, "THE PERFORMANCE OF ARRAYS OF WIND TURBINES", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL AERODYNAMICS, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING CO., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19800501), vol. 5, doi:10.1016/0167-6105(80)90044-6, ISSN 0304-3908, pages 403 - 430, XP008023145 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6105(80)90044-6 | [A] - STEINBUCH M ET AL, "OPTIMAL CONTROL OF WIND POWER PLANTS", JOURNAL OF WIND ENGINEERING AND INDUSTRIAL AERODYNAMICS, XX, XX, (19880101), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/0167-6105(88)90039-6, pages 237 - 246, XP008023141 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6105(88)90039-6 |