EP2169805 - Rotor assembly for synchronous reluctance machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/13] | Rotor assembly and rotor assembly manufacturing method for synchronous reluctance machines | ||
[2014/02] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magnussen, Freddy Bogvägen 7 SE-723 48 Västerås / SE | 02 /
Johansson, Erik Lavendelvägen 69 SE-722 45 Västerås / SE | 03 /
Kylander, Gunnar Skälbygatan 192 SE-724 76 Västerås / SE | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Magnussen, Freddy Bogvägen 7 SE-723 48, Västerås / SE | ||
02 /
Johansson, Erik Lavendelvägen 69 SE-722 45, Västerås / SE | |||
03 /
Kylander, Gunnar Skälbygatan 192 SE-724 76, Västerås / SE | Representative(s) | Marks, Frank, et al ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 08165523.5 | 30.09.2008 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169805 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169805 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/24, H02K15/02 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
H02K1/246 (EP);
H02K15/02 (EP);
H02K2201/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Rotoranordnung für Reluktanzmaschinen | [2014/09] | English: | Rotor assembly for synchronous reluctance machines | [2014/02] | French: | Ensemble de rotor pour des machines à réluctance variable | [2014/02] |
Former [2010/13] | Rotoranordnung und Rotorherstellungsverfahren für Reluktanzmaschinen | ||
Former [2010/13] | Rotor assembly and rotor assembly manufacturing method for synchronous reluctance machines | ||
Former [2010/13] | Ensemble de rotor et son procédé de fabrication pour des machines à réluctance variable | Examination procedure | 30.09.2008 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | 12.05.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.05.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | LI | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | IE | 30.09.2014 | LU | 30.09.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2016/46] |
Former [2016/28] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | BG | 02.10.2014 | |
NO | 02.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1111755 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7-20 * paragraphs [0073] - [0075] * [A] 5,6; | [Y]EP1503485 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7-10,13-19 * paragraphs [0022] , [0032] *; | [A]WO03041889 (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [Y]DE2727490 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 11,20 * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 14 *; | [Y]US4114019 (SANDOR LESLIE W) [Y] 12 * column 3, line 57 - line 67 *; | [A]DE10040978 (SCHULER HELD LASERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | US6675460 | US5296773 | WO2006121225 |