EP2045430 - Half-shell for forming thermal break door and window frames or the like, associated section and associated assembly process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO ASA Bygdoy Allé 2 0240 Oslo 2 / NO | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dampierre, Maurizio HYDRO BUILDING SYSTEMS S.p.A Via Meucci, 5 20060 Ornago (MI) / IT | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al MARCHI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08165569.8 | 01.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01932 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071932 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045430 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/273, // E06B3/263 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
E06B3/273 (EP,US);
E06B3/26305 (EP,US);
E06B2003/26358 (EP,US);
E06B2003/26359 (EP,US);
E06B2003/26374 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbschale zum Formen von Tür- und Fensterrahmen und dergleichen mit Wärmebarriere, zugehöriges Teilstück und zugehöriges Fügeverfahren | [2009/15] | English: | Half-shell for forming thermal break door and window frames or the like, associated section and associated assembly process | [2009/15] | French: | Demi-coque pour la formation d'une porte et des cadres de fenêtres, ou similaire d'isolation thermique, section correspondante et procédé d'assemblage correspondant | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |