EP2058259 - Winding core assembly for a roll winding device, winding core and roll winding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Georg Hahnenweg 9a 41466, Neuss / DE | [2009/20] | Application number, filing date | 08165668.8 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | DE20071000630 | 06.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007000630 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2058259 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2058259 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2058259 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/10, B65H18/02 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
B65H75/10 (EP);
B65H2301/4148 (EP);
B65H2701/534 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, IT, SE [2010/27] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wickelhülsenanordnung für eine Rollenwickeleinrichtung, Wickelhülse und Rollenwickeleinrichtung | [2009/20] | English: | Winding core assembly for a roll winding device, winding core and roll winding device | [2009/20] | French: | Agencement de mandrin de bobinage pour un dispositif d'enroulement de rouleaux, mandrin de bobinage et dispositif d'enroulement de rouleaux | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS508899U (-) [X] 1,10-12 * figure - *; | [X]JPS54118097U (-) [X] 1,10-12 * figure - *; | [A]JPS5767058U (-) [A] 1,11-12 * figure - *; | [A]WO9310033 (HAGLEITNER BETRIEBSHYGIENE [AT]) [A] 1,11-12* figure - *; | [X]GB2287238 (FERAMATIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-7,10-12 * pages 6-7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0200539 (METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,11-12 * figure - *; | [A]WO03004393 (CORE LINK AB [SE], et al) [A] 2-4,6-7 * figures 18,30 *; | [XY]JP2003300674 (SHINSEI HOSO KK) [X] 1-2,10-12 * abstract * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]EP1676804 (CORE HANDLING LTD OY [FI]) [Y] 2-7 * figure 1 * | by applicant | JP2003300674 |