EP2047822 - Embolic protection device having a filter frame with integral distal strain relief [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 NW 60th Avenue Miami Lakes, FL 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wijeratne, Lalith Hiran 5632 SW 88th Ter. Cooper City, FL FL33328-5168 / US | 02 /
Mosel, Brian James 6653 Spruce Lane Dublin, CA CA 94568 / US | 03 /
Rincon, Cesar Alberto 8450 N.W. 28th Street Sunrise, FL FL33322 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08166000.3 | 07.10.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | US20070870725 | 11.10.2007 Original published format: US 870725 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047822 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2047822 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61F2/01 (EP,US);
A61F2002/016 (EP,US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2230/008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | Embolieschutzvorrichtung mit Filterrahmen und integrierter distaler Entlastung | [2009/16] | English: | Embolic protection device having a filter frame with integral distal strain relief | [2009/16] | French: | Dispositif de protection embolique doté d'un support de filtre doté d'un réducteur de tension distal intégral | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004164030 (LOWE BRIAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022] - [0026] - [0030] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO03032868 (INCEPT LLC) [X] 1,15 * page 12, lines 23-27 * * figure 2c *; | [X]WO0149215 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1-3,14 * page 19, lines 13-17 * * page 20, lines 27,28 * * figures 3,7 *; | [A]WO03002019 (SALVIAC LTD [IE], et al) [A] 4,7,10 * page 39, lines 5,6 * * figure 85 *; | [A]US5437288 (SCHWARTZ ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, lines 26-52 * * figures 7,8 * | by applicant | US6179859 | US6468291 |