EP2174650 - Modified release emulsions for application to skin or vaginal mucosa [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polichem SA 50, Val Fleuri 1526 Luxembourg / LU | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mura, Emanuela Via Bellinzona, 76 I-22100, COMO / IT | 02 /
Mailland, Federico Viale Masia, 29 I-22100, COMO / IT | 03 /
Ceriani, Daniela Via Vignora, 9/D I-21050, Besano (Varese) / IT | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Marina 6 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08166058.1 | 08.10.2008 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174650 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/107, A61K31/345, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4174, A61K31/4412, A61K31/4418, A61K31/4745, A61K31/522, A61K31/569, A61P15/02, A61P15/12, A61P17/00 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/345 (KR);
A61K31/4164 (KR);
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (EP,KR,US);
A61P15/02 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/51] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modifizierte Freisetzungsemulsionen zur Anwendung auf der Haut und der Vaginalschleimhaut | [2010/15] | English: | Modified release emulsions for application to skin or vaginal mucosa | [2010/15] | French: | Émulsions à libération modifiée pour une application sur la peau ou la muqueuse vaginale | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02058689 (LOS ANGELES CHILDRENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [XY]WO03084538 (MEDICIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US]) [XY] 1-17 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * examples 1,2 *; | [XY]US2004087564 (WRIGHT D CRAIG [US], et al) [XY] 1-17 * page 2, paragraph 21 * * page 4, paragraphs 51,52 * * page 5, paragraph 54 *; | [Y]WO2007012977 (FOAMIX LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, paragraph 7 * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-11,20-28 *; | [Y]US2007071705 (DE OLIVEIRA MONICA A M [BR], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 80 * * examples 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2007099396 (FOAMIX LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 13 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1-9,18-36 *; | [Y]WO2007102052 (FOAMIX LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 3, paragraph 12; examples 1,3,4 * * page 25, paragraph 96 * * page 30, paragraph 106 *; | [XY]US2008075745 (SEN NILENDU [IN], et al) [XY] 1-17 * page 2, paragraph 19 * * examples 1,2 * |