EP2051347 - Method for balancing cells in a battery pack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seman, Andrew E, Jr. 11136 Bird River Grove Road White Marsh, MD 21162 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08166481.5 | 13.10.2008 | [2009/17] | Priority number, date | US20070999025P | 15.10.2007 Original published format: US 999025 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2051347 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2051347 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausgleich von Zellen in einer Batteriepackung | [2009/17] | English: | Method for balancing cells in a battery pack | [2009/17] | French: | Procédé d'équilibrage de cellules dans un bloc-batteries | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 28.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9905767 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 3-14 * * page 9, lines 1-26 * * page 10, lines 1-17 * * page 44, line 24 - page 46, line 10; figures 1,34 *; | [XI]US6975094 (LASCAUD STEPHANE [FR], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 1, lines 49-55 * * column 2, lines 19-29 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, lines 40-61 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 21 * * column 8, lines 4-7 * * column 8, lines 51-55; figures 1,2a,2b,3 * [I] 2-8,10-14; | [A]WO2006068429 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4; claims 13-22 *; | [A]US2007103113 (EMBREY JANET M [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0077] - [0079] - [0 92]; figures 10-12 *; | [A]GB2434264 (MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORP [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | by applicant | US6431289 | US6996909 | US20060071643 | US20070999025 | US20080170718 |