EP2053900 - Radio communication devices and method for controlling frequency selection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Mobile Communications GmbH Am Campeon 10-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjarnason, Elias Am Weichselgarten 49 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | 02 /
Karls, Ingolf Sternstr. 2 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
Bjarnason, Elias Am Weichselgarten 49 85630, Grasbrunn / DE | ||
02 /
Karls, Ingolf Sternstr. 2 85622, Feldkirchen / DE | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2012/21] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Schwepnitzer Str. 2 01097 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08166572.1 | 14.10.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | US20070876234 | 22.10.2007 Original published format: US 876234 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2053900 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2053900 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053900 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/10 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/10 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/18] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funkkommunikationsgeräte und Verfahren zum Steuern der Frequenzauswahl | [2009/18] | English: | Radio communication devices and method for controlling frequency selection | [2009/18] | French: | Dispositif de communication radio et procédé de contrôle de la sélection de la fréquence | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 26.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14163713.2 / EP2755441 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9629832 (PACIFIC COMM SCIENCES INC [US]) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - line 18 * * page 9, line 1 - line 14 * * figure 2 *; | [I]US2006135067 (DUNKO GREGORY A [US]) [I] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] *; | [I]US2007149187 (LEVY SHARON [IL]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A] - "Digital Enhanced Cordless Telecommunications (DECT); Common Digital Enhanced Cordless Telecommunications (DECT); Common Interface (CI); Part 3: Medium Access Control (MAC) layer", (20070801), URL: http://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_en/300100_300199/30017503/02.01.01_60/en_30017503v020101p.pdf, (20100318), XP002573874 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [10.5.2] * * paragraph [11.4] * * paragraph [11.10] * | Examination | WO2004028057 | WO2005020518 | US2005117546 | by applicant | WO2004028057 | WO2005020518 | US2005117546 | US2006135067 | US2007149187 |