EP2061072 - Flip chip wafer, flip chip die and manufacturing processes thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Singjang 11127 SW Partridge Loop Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woehrmannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08167131.5 | 21.10.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | US20070940481 | 15.11.2007 Original published format: US 940481 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2061072 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2061072 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H01L24/94 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2224/023 (EP);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05572 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1132 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1146 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1148 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1162 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11849 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11901 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13022 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/274 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27515 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27901 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29011 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29082 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29187 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73104 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73203 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L23/3171 (EP,US);
H01L23/3192 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/023, H01L2924/0001 (EP);
H01L2224/1146, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/01014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29187, H01L2924/0665 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2224/05552 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/12] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flipchip-Wafer, Flipchip und Herstellungsverfahren | [2009/21] | English: | Flip chip wafer, flip chip die and manufacturing processes thereof | [2009/21] | French: | Plaquette à puce à protubérances ("flip-chip"), puce à protubérances et leurs procédés de fabrication | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5641113 (SOMAKI MOTOAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * column 2, line 31 - column 8, line 44; figures 2A-2E,4A-4d * * column 9, line 47 - line 50 *; | [X]JP2000228417 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-6,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0025] - [0028] - [0033] - [0036] - [0047] , [0054] , [0074] , [0076]; figures 1,2,7,8,11 *; | [X]US6271107 (MASSINGILL THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 7,9,12 * column 3, line 21 - line 30; figures 1-5 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 43 - line 46 * * column 5, line 57 - line 60 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 27 * * column 6, line 57 - line 60 * * column 7, line 10 - line 16 * * column 8, lines 13-35,36-41 *; | [A]US2002064935 (HONDA HIROKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-6,10-13 * paragraphs [0021] , [0045] - [0060]; figures 2O-2S,3A-3F *; | [X]US6458622 (KESER LIZABETH ANN [US], et al) [X] 7,8,12 * column 4, line 56 - line 58; figures 8,9 ** column 6, lines 28-35,38-41 *; | [A]US2005224962 (AKAMATSU TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,10-13 * paragraphs [0060] - [0083]; figures 7-12 * | by applicant | - Q. TONG ET AL., "Recent advances on waver-level flip chip packaging process", ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, (2000), page 101, XP001054550 |