EP2063490 - Internal antennas for mobile communication devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IN4TEL Ltd. P.O. Box 12882, 60 Medinat Hayehudim Street 46 733 Herzlia Pituah / IL | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maoz, Joseph 23 Emek Bracha Street 67456 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
Kadichevitz, Michael 9 Klonimus Street 62644 Tel Aviv / IL | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Dorschner, David Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Patents Department 55 rue des Bruyères L-1274 Howald 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 08167354.3 | 09.07.2001 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | US20000217021P | 11.07.2000 Original published format: US 217021 P | US20000649023 | 28.08.2000 Original published format: US 649023 | [2009/22] | Previously filed application, date | EP20010947774 | 09.07.2001 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063490 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/10, H01Q5/00, H01Q1/38 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H01Q21/30 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (KR);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q13/16 (EP,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP,US);
H01Q5/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | 23.10.2008 | LT | 23.10.2008 | LV | 23.10.2008 | MK | 23.10.2008 | RO | 23.10.2008 | SI | 23.10.2008 | Title | German: | Interne Antennen für Mobilkommunikationsgeräte | [2009/22] | English: | Internal antennas for mobile communication devices | [2009/22] | French: | Antennes intérieures pour dispositifs de communication mobiles | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01947774.4 / EP1307947 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010947774) is 25.07.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5068670 (MAOZ JOSEPH [IL]) [Y] 1-10,19,20 * abstract * * column 10, line 48 - column 11, line 2 *; | [A]US5945954 (JOHNSON GREG F [US]) [A] 1-22 * figures 1,2,4,5 ** column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 32 *; | [A]US6028561 (TAKEI KEN [JP]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 10 *; | [Y]US6031503 (PREISS II JOSEPH A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,19,20 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, lines 10-42 * * column 4, lines 1-24 *; | [A]US6043786 (VANNATTA LOUIS JAY [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 10,11 * * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 45 * | by applicant | US5068670 | WO9913528 | EP0924797 | WO9936988 | US5929813 | US5945954 | US6002367 | US6025802 |