EP2056389 - Evaporator for fuel cell system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sung-Chul c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Ju-Yong c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Shin, Woo-Cheol c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Yong-Kul c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kong, Sang-Jun c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Son, In-Hyuk c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Ahn, Jin-Goo c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
Kim, Tae-Keun c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08167551.4 | 24.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | KR20070109503 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070109503 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2056389 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2056389 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/06, C01B3/32, B01B1/00, F28F7/02, F28F9/00 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
B01B1/005 (EP,US);
C01B3/32 (EP,US);
F28F7/02 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1288 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0071 (EP,US);
H01M8/04126 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | H01M8/06, C01B3/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/24] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verdampfer für ein Brennstoffzellensystem | [2009/19] | English: | Evaporator for fuel cell system | [2009/19] | French: | Évaporateur pour système de pile à combustible | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 23.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005282051 (ZHOU ZHIGANG [US]) [X] 1-9,13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0013] , [0015] - [0017] - [0022] - [0034] * * claims 1,6, 7,11,15,16 * [Y] 14,15; | [Y]EP1324414 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 14,15 * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]WO9410520 (LEVEL ENERGIETECH BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 6 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]CN101008557 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]JPS63217193 (EBARA CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | US2005282051 |