EP2058641 - Isokinetic probe for analysing pollution in the gases generated by an airplane engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snecma 2 Bld du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Snecma 2 Bld du General Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carichon, Sébastien 2, Passage Michel Ange 77400 Saint Thibaut / FR | 02 /
Del Arco, Serge 8 Bis, Place de Gaulle 77850 Hericy / FR | 03 /
Harivel, Nadine, Alice, Hélène 263, rue de la Mare à Quenette 77000 Vaux le Penil / FR | [2010/02] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
CARICHON, Sébastien 2, Passage Michel Ange 77400, SAINT THIBAUT / FR | ||
02 /
DEL ARCO, Serge 8 Bis, Place de Gaulle 77850, HERICY / FR | |||
03 /
HARIVEL, Nadine, Alice, Hélène 263, rue de la Mare à Quenette 77000, VAUX LE PENIL / FR | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08167593.6 | 27.10.2008 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | FR20070058751 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: FR 0758751 | [2009/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058641 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2058641 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/24 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G01N1/2247 (EP,US);
G01N1/2273 (EP,US);
G01N2001/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/03] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Isokinetische Sonde zur Analyse der Verschmutzung der Gase, die von einem Flugzeugmotor erzeugt werden | [2009/20] | English: | Isokinetic probe for analysing pollution in the gases generated by an airplane engine | [2009/20] | French: | Sonde iso-cinétique pour l'analyse de la pollution des gaz générés par un moteur d'avion | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 14.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2141220 (ATOMIC ENERGY COMMISSION) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 11 - line 15 * * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 13; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4034611 (HORLING JAMES E) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 26 * * column 2, line 25 - line 33 * * column 3, line 4 - line 54; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US3252323 (TORGESON WILLIAM L) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 9 - line 13 * * column 2, line 31 - line 50 * * column 3, line 27 - column 6, line 18; figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]US3395516 (SCHECTER ROGER M, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 13 - line 22 * * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 9; claim 1 * |