EP2055976 - High-capacity friction device for transmitting torque by sliding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lelasseux, Xavier 15, allée Santos Dumont 92150 Suresnes / FR | 02 /
Mitchell, Clément 66, rue de Plaisance 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | 03 /
Wascheul, Michael 5, rue Pierre Semard 78260 Achères / FR | [2009/19] | Application number, filing date | 08167719.7 | 28.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | FR20070058653 | 29.10.2007 Original published format: FR 0758653 | [2009/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055976 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/02 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
F16D23/04 (EP);
F16D13/26 (EP);
F16D2023/0681 (EP);
F16D2300/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | Hochleistungsfähige Friktionsvorrichtung zur Übertragung des Motordrehmoments durch Gleitreibung | [2009/19] | English: | High-capacity friction device for transmitting torque by sliding | [2009/19] | French: | Dispositif de friction à haute capacité pour transmission de couple par glissement | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2013 | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/36] | 26.04.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 11.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3286801 (WOJCIKOWSKI RICHARD J) [X] 1-4,8,9 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 65 * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]JP2000283270 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1491798 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2-4 * figure 9 * * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0155] *; | [A]FR2841956 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 8,9 * figure 3a *; | [A]WO2006133471 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 5-7 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR550501 (M. LOUIS VEYRET [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US3286801 |