EP2027873 - One dose vaccination with mycoplasma hyopneumoniae [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoetis Services LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2015/44] |
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states Zoetis P LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | ||
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Zoetis P LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | ||
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states PAH USA 15 LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keich, Robin Lee c/o Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 02 /
Sabbadini, Lisa Grace 14 Tipping Rock Rd Stonington, CT 06378 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
Keich, Robin, Lee c/o Pfizer Products Inc., Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | ||
02 /
Sabbadini, Lisa, Grace 14 Tipping Rock Rd Stonington, CT 06378 / US | |||
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
Keich, Robin, Lee c/o Pfizer Products Inc., Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | ||
02 /
Sabbadini, Lisa, Grace c/o Pfizer Products Inc., Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | Representative(s) | Mannion, Sally Kim, et al Zoetis UK Limited Walton Oaks Dorking Road Tadworth Surrey KT20 7NS / GB | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/07] | Mannion, Sally Kim, et al Pfizer Animal Health Walton Oaks Dorking Road Tadworth, Surrey KT20 7NS / GB | ||
Former [2012/33] | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2011/36] | England, Peter Michael, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Courgeon, Antoine, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Courgeon, Antoine Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08167761.9 | 07.06.2002 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | US20010302636P | 02.07.2001 Original published format: US 302636 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027873 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027873 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2027873 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61P31/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61K39/0241 (EP,NO,US);
A61K39/02 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/521 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/552 (EP,NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 25.08.2009 | LT | 25.08.2009 | LV | 25.08.2009 | MK | 25.08.2009 | RO | 25.08.2009 | SI | 25.08.2009 | Title | German: | Vakzination in einer Dosis mit Mycoplasma Hyopneumoniae | [2009/09] | English: | One dose vaccination with mycoplasma hyopneumoniae | [2009/09] | French: | Vaccin monodose à base de mycoplasma hyopneumoniae | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2014 | 19.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02735755.7 / EP1474067 | Divisional application(s) | EP14182639.6 / EP2842569 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020735755) is 02.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | [2018/33] |
Former [2017/07] | MC | 09.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9118627 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [Y] 2-4 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 2 * * page 6, lines 20-L * * page 7, lines 4-22 * * page 9, lines 21-24 * * page 12, lines 8-21 * * claims 1,3,6-8,10 *; | [PX]WO0210343 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [PX] 1-5 * abstract *; | [XY] - LLOYD L C ET AL, "Protection against enzootic pneumonia of pigs: intraperitoneal inoculation with live LKR strain of Mycoplasma hyopneumoniae.", AUSTRALIAN VETERINARY JOURNAL. JAN 1989, (198901), vol. 66, no. 1, ISSN 0005-0423, pages 9 - 12, XP008048811 [X] 1,5 * abstract * [Y] 2-4 | [PX] - DAWSON A ET AL, "STUDIES OF THE FIELD EFFICACY AND SAFETY OF A SINGLE-DOSE MYCOPLASMA HYOPNEUMONIAE VACCINE FOR PIGS", VETERINARY RECORD, BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, (20021102), vol. 151, no. 18, ISSN 0042-4900, pages 535 - 538, XP008048796 [PX] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/vr.151.18.535 | Examination | WO9407531 | - SCHWAGER J ET AL, "Maturation of the mitogen responsiveness, and IL2 and IL6 production by neonatal swine leukocytes.", VETERINARY IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOPATHOLOGY JUN 1997 LNKD- PUBMED:9239843, (199706), vol. 57, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-2427, pages 105 - 119 | - BOUMA A ET AL, "The influence of maternal immunity on the transmission of pseudorabies virus and on the effectiveness of vaccination.", VACCINE FEB 1997 LNKD- PUBMED:9139488, (199702), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 287 - 294 | - KAISER T.J. ET AL., "Mycoplasma hyopneumoniae vaccine administered to pigs at one day of age", AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF SWINE VETERINARIANS, 2009, (2009), page 157 | by applicant | WO9115593 | EP0475185 | US5252328 | WO9509870 | WO9628472 | US5565205 | US5788962 | WO9926664 | - FUTO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL, (1995), vol. 177, pages 1915 - 1917 | - FUTO ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 33, pages 680 - 683 | - WISE; KIM, J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 5546 - 5555 | - KING ET AL., VACCINE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 25 - 35 | - WILTON ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 144, pages 1931 - 1943 | - HSU ET AL., GENE, (1998), vol. 214, pages 13 - 23 |