EP2055881 - Opening and closing member control apparatus for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shintaro Intellectual Property Department c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08167847.6 | 29.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | JP20070282211 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007282211 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2055881 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2055881 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/20, E05F15/10, // E05F15/12, E05F15/14 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
E05F15/70 (EP,US);
E05F15/63 (EP,US);
E05F15/646 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/216 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/246 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/422 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/462 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/44 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/40 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/41 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/458 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/46 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/113 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/531 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | E05F15/20, E05F15/10, E05F15/12, E05F15/14, // E05F15/12, E05F15/14 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/34] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Öffnungs- und Schliesselement-Steuerungsvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2009/19] | English: | Opening and closing member control apparatus for vehicle | [2009/19] | French: | Appareil de commande d'élément d'ouverture ou de fermeture pour véhicule | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 21.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004155617 (SUZUKI SHINTARO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0009] , [0020] - [0027] - [0029] - [0032] - [0037] - [0041] - [0047] , [0048]; figures 1-8 * [I] 6; | [XI]DE10117933 (VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0030] , [0031]; figures 1-5 * [I] 6; | [XI]EP1278052 (MERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYS LTD [FR]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0013] - [0019] - [0024] , [0025] , [0035] - [0044] - [0047] , [0050]; figures 1-7 * [I] 6; | [X]WO03060270 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 9 - page 7, line 2; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPH09125820 | JP2001246936 |