EP2056294 - Apparatus, Medium and Method to Encode and Decode High Frequency Signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choo, Ki-hyun c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Oh, Eun-mi c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Mi-young c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jung-hoe c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Sung, Ho-sang c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/35] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Choo, Ki-hyun c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Oh, Eun-mi c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Mi-young c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Jung-hoe c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Sung, Ho-sang c/Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08167938.3 | 30.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | KR20070109823 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070109823 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2056294 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2056294 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2056294 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/02, G10L11/06 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G10L25/93 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G10L19/06 (KR);
G10L19/12 (KR);
G10L21/038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2010/42] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Medium und Verfahren zum Codieren und Decodieren eines Hochfrequenzsignals | [2009/19] | English: | Apparatus, Medium and Method to Encode and Decode High Frequency Signal | [2009/19] | French: | Appareil, support et procédé pour coder et décoder un signal haute fréquence | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 18.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.08.2011 | [2012/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0045379 (LILJERYD LARS GUSTAF [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 6-9 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 2 *; | [A]US2004138876 (KALLIO LOURA [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 8 * | [A] - EHRER A ET AL, "Audio coding technology of ExAC", INTELLIGENT MULTIMEDIA, VIDEO AND SPEECH PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF 2004 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HONG KONG, CHINA OCT. 20-22, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041020), ISBN 978-0-7803-8687-7, pages 290 - 293, XP010801441 [A] 1-15 *Section D 1)* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIMP.2004.1434057 | by applicant | WO0045379 |