EP2060355 - Stone saw blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG. Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kullmann, Jörg H., Dr. / Zum Steinbach 2 34286 Spangenberg / DE | 02 /
Kwanka, Werner, Dr. Emil-Nolde-Strasse 10 D 86157 Augsburg / DE | [2014/02] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
Kullmann, Jörg H., Dr. Zum Steinbach 2 34286 Spangenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Kwanka, Werner, Dr. Emil-Nolde-Strasse 10 D 86157 Augsburg / DE | |||
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
Kullmann, Jörg H., Dr. Zum Steinbach 2 34286 Spangenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Kwanka, Werner, Dr. Stadtbergerstrasse 12a 86157 Augsburg / DE | |||
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
Kullmann, Jörg H., Dr. Zum Steinbach 2 34286 Spangenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Kwanka, Werner, Dr. Scheideweg 13 34246 Vellmar / DE | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08167962.3 | 30.10.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20071054601 | 15.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054601 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060355 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2060355 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060355 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/12, B23D61/14, B28D1/12 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B23D61/121 (EP,US);
B23D61/14 (EP,US);
B28D1/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Steinsägeblatt | [2009/21] | English: | Stone saw blade | [2009/21] | French: | Lame de scie à pierres | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1808250 (KULLMANN WIKUS SAEGENFAB [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 3 * [Y] 4,5,7,10,11; | [XY]EP0715919 (KAMPMANN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * column 3, lines 44-50; figure 1 * [Y] 10; | [YA]EP1004414 (NEHER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012]; figures 4,5 * [A] 1-3,8; | [Y]US4848205 (SUZUKI YOSHIMITU [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, lines 27-31; figure - *; | [Y]DE4200423 (KULLMANN WIKUS SAEGENFAB [DE]) [Y] 7 * figures 5-7 *; | [A]EP0590408 (LEDERMANN & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006010696 (CRITELLI JAMES M [US]) [A] 10 * paragraph [0010]; figures 2,3 * | Examination | WO0119578 | EP0054885 | by applicant | DE4200423 | DE19963396 | EP0590408 | EP0715919 | DE19652208 |