EP2181880 - Electronic arrangement for controlling a signal from an instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Suite 800 Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davidsson, Staffan Byggmästaregatan 5 42668 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
Lindgren, Thomas Skararp 102 31058 Vessigebro / SE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | VALEA AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08168263.5 | 04.11.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181880 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181880 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, B60R1/00, B60Q1/52, G07C5/08 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B60R1/28 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60R2300/207 (EP);
B60R2300/304 (EP);
B60R2300/605 (EP);
B60R2300/804 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2011/02] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Anordnung zum Steuern eines Signals aus einem Instrument | [2010/18] | English: | Electronic arrangement for controlling a signal from an instrument | [2010/18] | French: | Agencement électronique pour le contrôle d'un signal à partir d'un instrument | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1080976 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0013] - [0017]; figure - *; | [X]EP1298001 (CLARION CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0038]; figure - *; | [A]US2007009137 (MIYOSHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0049] - [0082] - [0102] - [0147]; figure - *; | [A]DE102006036241 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0029] - [0043]; figure - * | by applicant | US5764139 | US6947064 | US7102496 | US7151997 |