EP2182372 - Detection of vehicle moving direction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Suite 800 Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bengtsson, Mattias / Landsvägsgatan 10 SE-413 04, GÖTEBORG / SE | 02 /
Nordström, Jan / Väderkvarnsgatan 6E SE-417 03, GÖTEBORG / SE | [2012/01] |
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
Bengtsson, Mattias Landsvägsgatan 10 SE-413 04, GÖTEBORG / SE | ||
02 /
Nordström, Jan Väderkvarnsgatan 6E SE-417 03, GÖTEBORG / SE | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Mossmark, Anders Lennart Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Mossmark, Anders Lennart Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08168270.0 | 04.11.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182372 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2182372 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01P13/00 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
G01P13/04 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2552/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2011/02] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Erfassung der Bewegungsrichtung eines Fahrzeugs | [2010/18] | English: | Detection of vehicle moving direction | [2010/18] | French: | Détection de la direction de déplacement d'un véhicule | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 06.11.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 09.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02062640 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,12-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 57 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph LAST - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 11, line 1 - line 18 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 13, line 3 - line 9; figures 1-7 * [Y] 6,10,11; | [XA]EP1764580 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1-4,12-18 * page 1, paragraph 13 - paragraph 28; figures 1-3 * [A] 8; | [Y]US2006030992 (IWATSUKI KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 6,10,11 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figure 7A *; | [A]US7319927 (SUN QIONG [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 7, line 36 - line 61; figure 5 * | by applicant | US5267166 |