EP2060824 - Torsion vibration damper device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dögel, Thomas Jahnstrasse 15 97688 Bad Kissingen / DE | [2009/21] | Application number, filing date | 08168347.6 | 05.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20071054567 | 15.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054567 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060824 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060824 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/16 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
F16F15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Torsionsschwingungsdämpferanordnung | [2009/21] | English: | Torsion vibration damper device | [2009/21] | French: | Agencement d'amortisseur de vibrations de torsions | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 19.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.01.2010 | CZ | 27.01.2010 | DK | 27.01.2010 | EE | 27.01.2010 | FI | 27.01.2010 | HR | 27.01.2010 | IE | 27.01.2010 | IT | 27.01.2010 | LT | 27.01.2010 | LV | 27.01.2010 | MT | 27.01.2010 | NL | 27.01.2010 | PL | 27.01.2010 | PT | 27.01.2010 | RO | 27.01.2010 | SE | 27.01.2010 | SI | 27.01.2010 | SK | 27.01.2010 | TR | 27.01.2010 | BG | 27.04.2010 | NO | 27.04.2010 | GR | 28.04.2010 | ES | 08.05.2010 | IS | 27.05.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
HR | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LV | 27.01.2010 | ||
MT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
TR | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
NO | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
IS | 27.05.2010 | ||
HU | 28.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
HR | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LV | 27.01.2010 | ||
MT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
NO | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
IS | 27.05.2010 | ||
HU | 28.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
HR | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LV | 27.01.2010 | ||
MT | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
NO | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
IS | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/28] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
HR | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LV | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
NO | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
IS | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
CZ | 27.01.2010 | ||
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
EE | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
HR | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
IT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LV | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PL | 27.01.2010 | ||
RO | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
SK | 27.01.2010 | ||
BG | 27.04.2010 | ||
NO | 27.04.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
IS | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 27.01.2010 | |
HR | 27.01.2010 | ||
LT | 27.01.2010 | ||
LV | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SI | 27.01.2010 | ||
NO | 27.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.05.2010 | ||
IS | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 08.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1346685 (YARROW & CO LTD) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE102005058531 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |