EP2022396 - Implantable device for recording intracranial pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | For all designated states Christoph Miethke GmbH & Co. KG Ulanenweg 2 14469 Potsdam / DE | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutze, Theodor Hochstattweg 6 78582 Balgheim / DE | 02 /
Schauer, Dirk Waldowallee 126 10318 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Miethke, Christoph Ulanenweg 2 14469 Potsdam / DE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08168394.8 | 27.04.2006 | [2009/07] | Priority number, date | DE20051020569 | 30.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005020569 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2022396 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2022396 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022396 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/03, A61B5/00 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61B5/031 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B2562/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Vorrichtung zur Erfassung von intracraniellen Drücken | [2009/07] | English: | Implantable device for recording intracranial pressure | [2009/07] | French: | Dispositif implantable destiné à l'enregistrement de pressions intracrâniennes | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06724600.9 / EP1887930 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060724600) is 06.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2006 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | AT | 27.04.2012 | LU | 27.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
AT | 27.04.2012 | ||
LU | 27.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
AT | 27.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
AT | 27.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3946724 (LA BALME MAURICE) [Y] 1-22,25-29 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2043911 (NAGANOKEIKI SEISAKUJO CO LTD) [Y] 1-22,25-29 * page 2, lines 15-92 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4660568 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [A] 1-22,25-29* figures 9-15 *; | [Y]DE3841429 (LUETGENAU WERNER DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 16,17,25-29 * abstract * * column 2, lines 31-35 * * figure 1 *; | [DY]EP1312302 (CRANIUM TELEMETRICS GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-22,25-29 * paragraphs [0016] - [0025] * | by applicant | US4676255 | US4738267 | DE19638813 | DE19705474 | DE19858172 | US6113553 | EP1312302 | DE10156494 |